AZ SB1043 | 2024 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-18 - House HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-2-0-0-0-0)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-18 - House HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-2-0-0-0-0)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Genetic counselors; licensure
Title
Genetic counselors; licensure
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-18 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-16 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-16 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-18 | House | House HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-2-0-0-0-0) |
2024-02-20 | House | House read second time |
2024-02-19 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2024-02-19 | House | Assigned to House HHS Committee |
2024-02-19 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2024-02-01 | House | Transmit to House |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (22-7-1-0) |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Senate HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Assigned to Senate HHS Committee |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2024-01-05 | Senate | Prefile |
Subjects
Advisory Committee
Civil Penalties
Classification
Confidentiality
Definitions
Deposit
Disciplinary Action
Enforcement
Exceptions
Exemption
Expiration
Extension
Fees
Genetic Counselors
Grounds For Denial
Health Services Licensing Fund
Hearings
Investigations
Licensure
Licensure Required
Professions And Occupations - Title 32 (h)
Prohibitions
Provisional License
Public Health
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
Reciprocity
Repeal
Revocation Of License
Rules
Subpoena
Supervision Requirements
Use Of Title
Violations
Civil Penalties
Classification
Confidentiality
Definitions
Deposit
Disciplinary Action
Enforcement
Exceptions
Exemption
Expiration
Extension
Fees
Genetic Counselors
Grounds For Denial
Health Services Licensing Fund
Hearings
Investigations
Licensure
Licensure Required
Professions And Occupations - Title 32 (h)
Prohibitions
Provisional License
Public Health
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
Reciprocity
Repeal
Revocation Of License
Rules
Subpoena
Supervision Requirements
Use Of Title
Violations
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
32 | 3201 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 414 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |