AZ SB1043 | 2011 | Fiftieth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Nursing care administrators; continuation
Title
Nursing care administrators; continuation
Sponsors
Sen. Nancy Barto [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-14 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - House - House Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-27 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-12 - Senate - Senate Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-14 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - House - House Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-27 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-12 - Senate - Senate Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-06 | Governor Signed | |
2011-04-05 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-04-04 | Transmit to Senate | |
2011-04-04 | House third reading , voting: (41-18-1-0) | |
2011-03-14 | House Consent Calendar March 14, 2011 @ 3:30 PM | |
2011-03-15 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-03-15 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-03-14 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0) | |
2011-02-21 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2011-02-23 | House HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0-0) | |
2011-02-22 | Referred to House HHS Committee | |
2011-02-22 | House read second time | |
2011-02-21 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2011-02-21 | Assigned to House HHS Committee | |
2011-02-21 | Introduced in House and read first time | |
2011-01-27 | Transmit to House | |
2011-01-27 | Senate third reading , voting: (23-4-3-0) | |
2011-01-24 | Senate Consent Calendar January 24, 2011 @ 2:45 PM | |
2011-01-25 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-01-25 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-01-24 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2011-01-10 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-01-12 | Senate HMLR Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-0-2-0) | |
2011-01-11 | Referred to Senate HMLR Committee | |
2011-01-11 | Senate read second time | |
2011-01-10 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-01-10 | Assigned to Senate HMLR Committee | |
2011-01-10 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |