AZ SB1036 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - Chapter 170
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - Chapter 170
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Arizona medical board; continuation
Title
Arizona medical board; continuation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-29 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-06 | Senate | Chapter 170 |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2019-04-29 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (59-0-1-0) |
2019-03-19 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-03-19 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-03-18 | House | House consent calendar |
2019-03-18 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2019-03-07 | House | House HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-1-0-0) |
2019-02-27 | House | House read second time |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to House HHS Committee |
2019-02-26 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2019-02-04 | House | Transmit to House |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0) |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Senate HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0) |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Assigned to Senate HHS Committee |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2019-01-11 | Senate | Prefile |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
41 | 3019.04 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 3027.04 | New Code | See Bill Text |