AZ SB1033 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Chapter 167
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Chapter 167
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Property tax statements; mortgaged property
Title
Property tax statements; mortgaged property
Sponsors
Sen. Vince Leach [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-25 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Ways & Means Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Ways & Means Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Senate | Chapter 167 |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2019-04-25 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (57-0-3-0) |
2019-03-19 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-03-19 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-03-18 | House | House consent calendar |
2019-03-18 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2019-03-13 | House | House WM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-1-0-0-0-0) |
2019-02-27 | House | House read second time |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to House WM Committee |
2019-02-26 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2019-02-12 | House | Transmit to House |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (26-4-0-0) |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (9-1-0-0) |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Prefile |