AZ SB1030 | 2010 | Forty-ninth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-27 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-27 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Driver license violations; suspensions
Title
Driver license violations; suspensions
Sponsors
Rep. Sam Crump [R] | Sen. David Gowan [R] | Sen. Linda Gray [R] | Rep. Laurin Hendrix [R] |
Sen. John Huppenthal [R] | Rep. Steve Montenegro [R] | Sen. Russell Pearce [R] | Sen. Michele Reagan [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-27 | Governor Signed | |
2010-04-21 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2010-04-20 | Transmit to Senate | |
2010-04-20 | House third reading , voting: (57-0-3-0) | |
2010-04-15 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass | |
2010-04-15 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-15 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-15 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-2-0-1-0) | |
2010-03-30 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2010-04-08 | House TI Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0-0) | |
2010-03-31 | Referred to House TI Committee | |
2010-03-31 | House read second time | |
2010-03-30 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2010-03-30 | Assigned to House TI Committee | |
2010-03-30 | Introduced in House and read first time | |
2010-03-25 | Transmit to House | |
2010-03-25 | Senate third reading , voting: (29-0-1-0) | |
2010-03-23 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2010-03-16 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-03-16 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-03-15 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2010-01-11 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-03-08 | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-0-1-0) | |
2010-03-02 | Referred to Senate APPROP Committee | |
2010-03-02 | Senate NRIPD Committee action: Withdrawn | |
2010-01-12 | Referred to Senate NRIPD Committee | |
2010-01-12 | Senate read second time | |
2010-01-11 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-03-02 | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee | |
2010-01-11 | Assigned to Senate NRIPD Committee | |
2010-01-11 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |