AZ SB1028 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-19 - Senate ED Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-0-0-0)
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Alternative assessment; special education

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alternative assessment; special education

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-01-19 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-19SenateSenate ED Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-0-0-0)
2021-01-12SenateSenate read second time
2021-01-11SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2021-01-11SenateAssigned to Senate ED Committee
2021-01-11SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2021-01-04SenatePrefile

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
15744New CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback