AZ SB1026 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-16 - Senate APPROP Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0)
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-16 - Senate APPROP Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0)
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriations; extended bus routes
Title
Appropriations; extended bus routes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-16 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2021-01-04 | Senate | Prefile |
Subjects
Adot
Appropriating Monies
Appropriation
Assessment
Buses
Department Of Transportation
Public Transportation
Appropriating Monies
Appropriation
Assessment
Buses
Department Of Transportation
Public Transportation