AZ SB1022 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-19 - Senate TPS Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (6-0-2-0)
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-19 - Senate TPS Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (6-0-2-0)
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Technical correction; veterans; conservatorship
Title
Technical correction; veterans; conservatorship
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Public Safety Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-19 | Senate | Senate TPS Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (6-0-2-0) |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Assigned to Senate TPS Committee |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2019-12-05 | Senate | Prefile |
Subjects
Conservatorships
Department Of Veterans' Services
Executor
Guardians
Method Of Payment
State Government - Title 41
Technical Correction
Veterans
Department Of Veterans' Services
Executor
Guardians
Method Of Payment
State Government - Title 41
Technical Correction
Veterans