AZ SB1019 | 2024 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-18 - House HHS Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0)
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-18 - House HHS Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0)
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriation; health innovation trust fund
Title
Appropriation; health innovation trust fund
Sponsors
Sen. Thomas Shope [R] | Sen. Christine Marsh [D] | Rep. David Cook [R] | Rep. Jennifer Pawlik [D] |
Rep. Laura Terech [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-18 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-16 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-16 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-18 | House | House HHS Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0) |
2024-03-13 | House | House read second time |
2024-03-12 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2024-03-12 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2024-03-12 | House | Assigned to House HHS Committee |
2024-03-12 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2024-03-05 | House | Transmit to House |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (19-9-2-0) |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-2-1-0) |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Senate HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2024-01-08 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2024-01-08 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2024-01-08 | Senate | Assigned to Senate HHS Committee |
2024-01-08 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2023-12-19 | Senate | Prefile |