AZ SB1018 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Chapter 56
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Chapter 56
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
DCS; report requirement
Title
DCS; report requirement
Sponsors
Sen. Nancy Barto [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-15 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-13 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-13 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-18 | Senate | Chapter 56 |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2021-03-15 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (57-1-2-0) |
2021-03-11 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2021-03-09 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-09 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-08 | House | House consent calendar |
2021-03-08 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0) |
2021-03-01 | House | House HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-24 | House | House read second time |
2021-02-23 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-02-23 | House | Assigned to House HHS Committee |
2021-02-23 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2021-02-11 | House | Transmit to House |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0) |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2021-01-13 | Senate | Senate HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0) |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Assigned to Senate HHS Committee |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2020-12-16 | Senate | Prefile |
Subjects
Adoption
Adoptive Child Danger
Complex Trauma
Dcs
Department Of Child Safety
Report
Reporting Requirement (h)
Reporting Requirements
Adoptive Child Danger
Complex Trauma
Dcs
Department Of Child Safety
Report
Reporting Requirement (h)
Reporting Requirements