AZ SB1015 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Note: Replaces legislation HB2292
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-12 - Chapter 13
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-12 - Chapter 13
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Physician assistants; licensure; board
Title
Physician assistants; licensure; board
Sponsors
Sen. Nancy Barto [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-13 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-13 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-12 | Senate | Chapter 13 |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2021-02-04 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (59-0-0-0) |
2021-01-28 | House | Transmit to House |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0) |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2021-01-13 | Senate | Senate HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0) |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Assigned to Senate HHS Committee |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2020-12-16 | Senate | Prefile |
Same As/Similar To
HB2292 (Replaces) 2021-02-02 - House minority caucus: Do pass
Subjects
Arizona Regulatory Board Of Physician Assistants
Board (h)
Licensure
Physician Assistant Board
Physician Assistants
Professions And Occupations - Title 32
Board (h)
Licensure
Physician Assistant Board
Physician Assistants
Professions And Occupations - Title 32
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
32 | 2503 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 2558 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |