AZ SB1014 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular


Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-06 - House minority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]


Municipal zoning; rezoning protests

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.


Municipal zoning; rezoning protests


Roll Calls

2018-03-05 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House Local and International Affairs Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]


2018-03-06HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-06HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-05HouseHouse Committee of the Whole consent calendar
2018-03-05HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0-0)
2018-02-28HouseHouse LIA Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-0-0-2-0-0)
2018-02-20HouseHouse read second time
2018-02-19HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2018-02-19HouseAssigned to House LIA Committee
2018-02-19HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2018-01-29HouseTransmit to House
2018-01-29SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (23-7-0-0)
2018-01-23SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2018-01-23SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2018-01-22SenateSenate consent calendar
2018-01-22SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2018-01-17SenateSenate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0)
2018-01-09SenateSenate read second time
2018-01-08SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2018-01-08SenateAssigned to Senate GOV Committee
2018-01-08SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
9462.04Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

Amendment and international affairs.docx.htm
Roll Call
Roll Call
Roll Call
Roll Call
Roll Call

Bill Comments