AZ SB1012 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-06 - House TRANS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-06 - House TRANS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Automobile theft authority; appropriation
Title
Automobile theft authority; appropriation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-06 - House - House Transportation Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-06 | House | House TRANS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0-0-0) |
2019-02-27 | House | House read second time |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to House TRANS Committee |
2019-02-26 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2019-02-18 | House | Transmit to House |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0) |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0) |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2018-12-27 | Senate | Prefile |
Subjects
Appropriating Monies
Automobile Theft Authority
Conditional Enactment
Funds
Report
State Government - Title 41
Automobile Theft Authority
Conditional Enactment
Funds
Report
State Government - Title 41