AZ SB1007 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Chapter 180
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Chapter 180
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Insurance; corporate governance; disclosure
Title
Insurance; corporate governance; disclosure
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-30 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-07 | Senate | Chapter 180 |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2019-04-30 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (59-0-1-0) |
2019-03-14 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2019-03-12 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-03-12 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-03-11 | House | House consent calendar |
2019-03-11 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2019-03-05 | House | House COM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2019-02-27 | House | House read second time |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to House COM Committee |
2019-02-26 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2019-02-04 | House | Transmit to House |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0) |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-0) |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2018-12-19 | Senate | Prefile |
Subjects
Civil Penalty
Confidentiality
Corporate Governance
Disclosure
Insurance - Title 20
Nonseverability
Political Subdivisions
Required Disclosure
Rules
Standards
Third-party Consultants
Transaction Of Insurance Business
Confidentiality
Corporate Governance
Disclosure
Insurance - Title 20
Nonseverability
Political Subdivisions
Required Disclosure
Rules
Standards
Third-party Consultants
Transaction Of Insurance Business