AZ SB1005 | 2010 | Forty-ninth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-26 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-26 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
PSPRS; ordinary disability; eliminate offset
Title
PSPRS; ordinary disability; eliminate offset
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-26 | Governor Signed | |
2010-04-20 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2010-04-20 | Senate final reading , voting: (20-8-2-0) | |
2010-04-20 | Senate Concurrence , voting: (0-0-0-0) | |
2010-04-20 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-20 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-14 | Transmit to Senate | |
2010-04-14 | House third reading , voting: (41-14-5-0) | |
2010-04-13 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2010-04-13 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-13 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-12 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-0-0-3-0) | |
2010-03-30 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2010-04-06 | House PERER Committee action: Withdrawn | |
2010-03-30 | Referred to House PERER Committee | |
2010-04-07 | House MAPS Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (5-2-0-1-0) | |
2010-03-31 | Referred to House MAPS Committee | |
2010-03-31 | House read second time | |
2010-03-30 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2010-03-30 | Assigned to House PERER Committee | |
2010-04-06 | Assigned to House MAPS Committee | |
2010-03-30 | Introduced in House and read first time | |
2010-03-18 | Transmit to House | |
2010-03-18 | Senate third reading , voting: (26-3-1-0) | |
2010-03-08 | Senate Consent Calendar March 08, 2010 @ 2:57 PM | |
2010-03-16 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-03-16 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-03-08 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2010-01-11 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-02-25 | Senate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-1-0) | |
2010-01-12 | Referred to Senate GOV Committee | |
2010-01-12 | Senate read second time | |
2010-01-11 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-01-11 | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee | |
2010-01-11 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |