AZ SB1004 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Chapter 10
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Insurance; surplus lines; reports; payments

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Insurance; surplus lines; reports; payments

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-14 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-22SenateChapter 10
2019-03-22SenateGovernor Signed
2019-03-18SenateTransmitted to Governor
2019-03-14SenateTransmit to Senate
2019-03-14HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (59-0-1-0)
2019-03-12HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2019-03-12HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2019-03-11HouseHouse consent calendar
2019-03-11HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
2019-03-05HouseHouse COM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-1-0-0)
2019-02-27HouseHouse read second time
2019-02-26HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2019-02-26HouseAssigned to House COM Committee
2019-02-26HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2019-02-05HouseTransmit to House
2019-02-05SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0)
2019-01-29SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2019-01-29SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2019-01-28SenateSenate consent calendar
2019-01-28SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2019-01-16SenateSenate FIN Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-0)
2019-01-15SenateSenate read second time
2019-01-14SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2019-01-14SenateAssigned to Senate FIN Committee
2019-01-14SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2018-12-18SenatePrefile

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
20408Amended CodeSee Bill Text
20416Amended CodeSee Bill Text
20417Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/71009
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/sb1004p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/sb1004s.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/laws/0010.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71009&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71009&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71009&billStatusActionId=185824&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71009&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71009&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71009&billStatusActionId=188339&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback