AZ SB1003 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-08 - Chapter 282
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-08 - Chapter 282
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
DCS; investigations; custody; oversight committee
Title
DCS; investigations; custody; oversight committee
Sponsors
Sen. Nancy Barto [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-04 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - House - Motion SUB Motion to Retain on Calendar (Y: 30 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - House - House Health Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - House - Motion SUB Motion to Retain on Calendar (Y: 30 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - House - House Health Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-08 | Senate | Chapter 282 |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Senate final reading PASSED, voting: (30-0-0-0) |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Senate concurs |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee recommended |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Conference |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2017-05-04 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (57-0-3-0) |
2017-05-04 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2017-04-17 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2017-04-17 | House | House miscellaneous motion: SUB Motion to Retain on Calendar, voting: (30-28-1-0) |
2017-04-12 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2017-04-04 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-04-04 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-04-03 | House | House Committee of the Whole consent calendar |
2017-04-03 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-3-0-0) |
2017-03-23 | House | House HEALTH Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-0-0-1-0-0) |
2017-03-06 | House | House read second time |
2017-03-02 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2017-03-02 | House | Assigned to House HEALTH Committee |
2017-03-02 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2017-02-28 | House | Transmit to House |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0) |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Senate HHS Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Assigned to Senate HHS Committee |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2016-12-07 | Senate | Prefile |
Subjects
Boards, Commissions And Committees -- New
Child Safety
Custody
Dcs
Dcs Oversight Committee
Dcs Procedures
Financial Responsibility
Insurance
State Government
Technical Correction
Child Safety
Custody
Dcs
Dcs Oversight Committee
Dcs Procedures
Financial Responsibility
Insurance
State Government
Technical Correction
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 236 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 1292 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
8 | 456 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
8 | 501 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
8 | 821 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
8 | 823 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |