AZ SB1003 | 2010 | Forty-ninth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-25 - Transmit to Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-25 - Transmit to Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Veterans' services; military installation fund.
Title
Veterans' services; military installation fund.
Sponsors
Rep. Jack Harper [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-25 | Transmit to Senate | |
2010-01-25 | House third reading , voting: (28-0-2-0) | |
2010-01-19 | House Consent Calendar January 19, 2010 @ 8:54 AM | |
2010-01-19 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-01-19 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-01-11 | Referred to House Committee | |
2010-01-12 | Referred to House Committee | |
2010-01-12 | House read second time | |
2010-01-25 | Transmit to House | |
2010-01-25 | Senate third reading , voting: (28-0-2-0) | |
2010-01-19 | Senate Consent Calendar January 19, 2010 @ 8:54 AM | |
2010-01-19 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-01-19 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-01-19 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2010-01-11 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-01-13 | Senate VMA Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0) | |
2010-01-12 | Referred to Senate VMA Committee | |
2010-01-12 | Senate read second time | |
2010-01-11 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-01-11 | Assigned to Senate VMA Committee | |
2010-01-11 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |