AZ HJR2002 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular

Note: Replaces legislation SJR1003

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-02 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Lower Colorado basin; forbearance authority.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Lower Colorado basin; forbearance authority.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - Motion HJR 2002 substituted for SJR 1003. Motion carried. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - House - House Land, Agriculture and Rural Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-02SenateGovernor Signed
2017-03-01SenateTransmitted to Governor
2017-02-28HouseTransmit to House
2017-02-28SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0)
2017-02-28SenateSenate miscellaneous motion: HJR 2002 substituted for SJR 1003. Motion carried.
2017-02-28SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2017-02-22SenateTransmit to Senate
2017-02-21HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (58-0-2-0)
2017-02-16HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2017-02-16HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2017-02-15HouseHouse consent calendar
2017-02-15HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0-0)
2017-02-09HouseHouse LARA Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0)
2017-02-06HouseHouse read second time
2017-02-02HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2017-02-02HouseAssigned to House LARA Committee
2017-02-02HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Same As/Similar To

SJR1003 (Replaces) 2017-02-27 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass

Subjects


Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/69408
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/hjr2002p.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/hjr2002h.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/laws/hjr2002.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69408&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69408&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69408&billStatusActionId=175342&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69408&billStatusActionId=176099&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69408&billStatusActionId=176111&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback