AZ SJR1003 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular
Note: Legislation replaced by HJR2002
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-27 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-27 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Lower Colorado basin; forbearance authority
Title
Lower Colorado basin; forbearance authority
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Senate NREW Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-1-0) |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Assigned to Senate NREW Committee |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
HJR2002 (Replaced by) 2017-03-02 - Governor Signed
Subjects
Colorado Basin
Colorado River
Cooperative Projects
Director Of Water Resources
Forbearance Authority
Mexico
Colorado River
Cooperative Projects
Director Of Water Resources
Forbearance Authority
Mexico