AZ HJR2001 | 2012 | Fiftieth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-12 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on April 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-12 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
International forces; American soil; opposition
Title
International forces; American soil; opposition
Sponsors
Sen. Ron Gould [R] | Rep. Jack Harper [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-05 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - Senate - Senate Border Security, Federalism and States Sovereignty Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 19 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-01-25 - House - House Military Affairs and Public Safety Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - Senate - Senate Border Security, Federalism and States Sovereignty Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 19 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-01-25 - House - House Military Affairs and Public Safety Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-12 | Governor Vetoed | |
2012-04-09 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2012-04-05 | Transmit to House | |
2012-04-05 | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (20-9-1-0) | |
2012-04-05 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass | |
2012-03-05 | Senate Consent Calendar March 05, 2012 @ 1:35 PM with Objections | |
2012-03-06 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-03-06 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-03-05 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2012-02-27 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-03-01 | Senate BSFSS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-2-0) | |
2012-02-28 | Referred to Senate BSFSS Committee | |
2012-02-28 | Senate read second time | |
2012-02-27 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-02-27 | Assigned to Senate BSFSS Committee | |
2012-02-27 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | |
2012-02-24 | Transmit to Senate | |
2012-02-23 | House third reading PASSED voting: (37-19-3-0) | |
2012-02-23 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2012-02-21 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-02-21 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-02-15 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0) | |
2012-01-17 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2012-01-25 | House MAPS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-2-0-0-0) | |
2012-01-18 | Referred to House MAPS Committee | |
2012-01-18 | House read second time | |
2012-01-17 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2012-01-17 | Assigned to House MAPS Committee | |
2012-01-17 | Introduced in House and read first time |