AZ HCR2052 | 2024 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-13 - Senate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-1-0)
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-13 - Senate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-1-0)
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Rulemaking; legislative authority
Title
Rulemaking; legislative authority
Sponsors
Rep. Cory McGarr [R] | Rep. John Gillette [R] | Rep. Gail Griffin [R] | Rep. Justin Heap [R] |
Rep. Rachel Jones [R] | Rep. Alexander Kolodin [R] | Rep. Barbara Parker [R] | Rep. Austin Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-13 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-02-28 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - House - House Regulatory Affairs Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - House - House Regulatory Affairs Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-13 | Senate | Senate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-1-0) |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2024-02-28 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (31-28-0-0) |
2024-02-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2024-02-20 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-20 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-20 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2024-02-14 | House | House RA Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (4-2-0-0-0-0) |
2024-02-08 | House | House read second time |
2024-02-06 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | Assigned to House RA Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |