AZ HCR2032 | 2024 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-26 - Senate majority caucus: Do pass
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-26 - Senate majority caucus: Do pass
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Voting centers; precinct voting
Title
Voting centers; precinct voting
Sponsors
Rep. Rachel Keshel [R] | Rep. David Marshall [R] | Rep. Barbara Parker [R] | Rep. Austin Smith [R] |
Sen. Wendy Rogers [R] | Sen. Justine Wadsack [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-25 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-02-28 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-24 - House - House Municipal Oversight & Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-02-28 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-24 - House - House Municipal Oversight & Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-26 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (4-3-0-0) |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Senate ELEC Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (4-3-1-0) |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Assigned to Senate ELEC Committee |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Assigned to Senate ELEC Committee |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2024-02-28 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (31-28-0-0) |
2024-02-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2024-02-20 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-20 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-20 | House | House consent calendar |
2024-02-20 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2024-01-24 | House | House MOE Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-4-0-0-0-0) |
2024-01-23 | House | House read second time |
2024-01-22 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2024-01-22 | House | Assigned to House MOE Committee |
2024-01-22 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 1017 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
16 | 1018 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
16 | 411 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
16 | 531 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
16 | 542 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
16 | 579.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
16 | 579.02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |