AZ HCR2032 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 25-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-0-0)
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-0-0)
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Initiatives; single subject; title
Title
Initiatives; single subject; title
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-0-0) |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2020-02-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2020-02-26 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (31-28-1-0) |
2020-02-25 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-25 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-25 | House | House consent calendar |
2020-02-25 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0) |
2020-02-18 | House | House ELECT Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-4-0-0-0-0) |
2020-02-13 | House | House read second time |
2020-02-12 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2020-02-12 | House | Assigned to House ELECT Committee |
2020-02-12 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |