AZ HCR2029 | 2010 | Forty-ninth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-02 - House Consent Calendar March 02, 2010 @ 3:55 PM
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-02 - House Consent Calendar March 02, 2010 @ 3:55 PM
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Legislature; term limits repeal.
Title
Legislature; term limits repeal.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-02 | House Consent Calendar March 02, 2010 @ 3:55 PM | |
2010-03-02 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (4-0-2-2-0) | |
2010-02-15 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2010-02-24 | House GOV Committee action: Withdrawn | |
2010-02-15 | Referred to House GOV Committee | |
2010-02-25 | House JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-2-0-1-0) | |
2010-02-16 | Referred to House JUD Committee | |
2010-02-16 | House read second time | |
2010-02-15 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2010-02-15 | Assigned to House GOV Committee | |
2010-02-24 | Assigned to House JUD Committee | |
2010-02-15 | Introduced in House and read first time |