AZ HCR2023 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 37-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-12 - Transmitted to Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 37-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-12 - Transmitted to Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Elections; state authority; infringement; opposition
Title
Elections; state authority; infringement; opposition
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-07 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House Government & Elections Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House Government & Elections Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-12 | Transmitted to Secretary of State | |
2021-04-07 | House | Transmit to House |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (16-14-0-0) |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Senate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-3-0-0) |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2021-03-04 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (31-29-0-0) |
2021-02-25 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2021-02-23 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-23 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-23 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-18 | House | House GE Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-6-0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-02 | House | House read second time |
2021-02-01 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-02-01 | House | Assigned to House GE Committee |
2021-02-01 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |