AZ HCR2009 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Transmitted to Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Pornography; public health crisis

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pornography; public health crisis

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-07 Transmitted to Secretary of State
2019-05-06HouseTransmit to House
2019-05-06SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (16-13-1-0)
2019-05-01SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2019-04-02SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2019-04-02SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2019-04-01SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2019-03-28SenateSenate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-1-1-0)
2019-03-21SenateSenate read second time
2019-03-19SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2019-03-19SenateAssigned to Senate JUD Committee
2019-03-19SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2019-02-26SenateTransmit to Senate
2019-02-25HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (32-28-0-0)
2019-02-25HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2019-02-19HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-19HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-18HouseHouse consent calendar
2019-02-18HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
2019-02-07HouseHouse HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-3-1-0-0-0)
2019-02-06HouseHouse read second time
2019-02-05HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2019-02-05HouseAssigned to House HHS Committee
2019-02-05HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/71223
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/hcr2009p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/hcr2009h.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/laws/hcr2009.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71223&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71223&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71223&billStatusActionId=186784&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71223&billStatusActionId=186836&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71223&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71223&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71223&billStatusActionId=189266&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71223&billStatusActionId=189391&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback