AZ HCM2003 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Passed on March 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-30 - Transmitted to Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Passed on March 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-30 - Transmitted to Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Urging EPA, Congress; nuclear power
Title
Urging EPA, Congress; nuclear power
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-29 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-16 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 24 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House Energy, Environment and Natural Resources Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-16 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 24 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House Energy, Environment and Natural Resources Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-30 | Transmitted to Secretary of State | |
2017-03-29 | House | Transmit to House |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (18-11-1-0) |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Senate NREW Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-1-0) |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Assigned to Senate NREW Committee |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2017-02-16 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (34-24-2-0) |
2017-02-16 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2017-02-14 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-14 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-13 | House | House consent calendar |
2017-02-13 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2017-02-07 | House | House EENR Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-2-0-0-0-0) |
2017-01-30 | House | House read second time |
2017-01-26 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2017-01-26 | House | Assigned to House EENR Committee |
2017-01-26 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |