AZ HB2901 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Note: Legislation replaced by SB1684
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-23 - House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-23 - House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Revenue; budget reconciliation; 2020-2021
Title
Revenue; budget reconciliation; 2020-2021
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-23 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-18 - House - House Rules Committee Action (DP/C&P) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-18 - House - House Rules Committee Action (DP/C&P) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-23 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2020-03-18 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-03-18 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-03-18 | House | House read second time |
2020-03-18 | House | House RULES Committee action: DP/C&P, voting: (5-3-0-0-0-0) |
2020-03-17 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2020-03-17 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
SB1684 (Replaced by) 2020-03-28 - Chapter 52
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 1098.17 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 167 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 423 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 466 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |