AZ SB1684 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Note: Replaces legislation HB2901
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-28 - Chapter 52
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-28 - Chapter 52
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Revenue; budget reconciliation; 2020-2021.
Title
Revenue; budget reconciliation; 2020-2021.
Sponsors
Sen. Karen Fann [R] | Sen. David Gowan [R] | Sen. Vince Leach [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-23 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-19 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-19 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (DP/PFC) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-19 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-19 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (DP/PFC) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-28 | Senate | Chapter 52 |
2020-03-28 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2020-03-23 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2020-03-23 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2020-03-23 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (60-0-0-0) |
2020-03-19 | House | Transmit to House |
2020-03-19 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (28-2-0-0) |
2020-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2020-03-19 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Do pass and proper for consideration, voting: (6-1-1-0) |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
HB2901 (Replaces) 2020-03-23 - House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
Subjects
Appropriating Monies
Budget Bills
Budget Reconciliation
Department Of Gaming
Legislative Intent
Peace Officers
Revenue
Budget Bills
Budget Reconciliation
Department Of Gaming
Legislative Intent
Peace Officers
Revenue
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 1098.17 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 167 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 423 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 466 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |