AZ HB2889 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-09 - Chapter 202
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-09 - Chapter 202
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Sentencing; sexual offenses; children
Title
Sentencing; sexual offenses; children
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-07 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-09 | Senate | Chapter 202 |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-04-07 | House | House final reading PASSED, voting: (57-1-2-0) |
2021-04-07 | House | House concurs |
2021-04-07 | House | House minority caucus: Conference |
2021-04-07 | House | House Conference Committee recommended |
2021-04-05 | House | Transmit to House |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0) |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Senate JUD Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (7-0-1-0) |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2021-03-01 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (51-1-8-0) |
2021-03-01 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2021-02-22 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-22 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-22 | House | House consent calendar |
2021-02-22 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-17 | House | House JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-16 | House | House read second time |
2021-02-15 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-02-15 | House | Assigned to House JUD Committee |
2021-02-15 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Children
Criminal Code - Title 13
Prisons And Prisoners - Title 31
Sentence
Sentencing
Sex Trafficking
Sexual Offenses
State Government - Title 41
Criminal Code - Title 13
Prisons And Prisoners - Title 31
Sentence
Sentencing
Sex Trafficking
Sexual Offenses
State Government - Title 41
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
13 | 1307 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
13 | 3212 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
13 | 3409 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
13 | 3552 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
13 | 3553 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
13 | 3560 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
13 | 705 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
31 | 412 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 1604.11 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 1604.13 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |