AZ HB2879 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 27-7)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Assigned to Senate RULES Committee
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

DOC; substance abuse programs; appropriations

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DOC; substance abuse programs; appropriations

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-12 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House Public Safety Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-08SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2020-05-08SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2020-03-12SenateTransmit to Senate
2020-03-12HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (56-2-2-0)
2020-03-10HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2020-03-04HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
2020-02-27HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
2020-02-26HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2020-02-26HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2020-02-26HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-3-0-0-0-0)
2020-02-24HouseHouse APPROP Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (10-1-0-0-0-0)
2020-02-19HouseHouse PS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-0-0-0-0)
2020-02-13HouseHouse read second time
2020-02-12HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2020-02-12HouseAssigned to House APPROP Committee
2020-02-12HouseAssigned to House PS Committee
2020-02-12HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
362803Amended CodeSee Bill Text
362806Amended CodeSee Bill Text
362817Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/74174
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/bills/hb2879p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/bills/hb2879h.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/proposed/h.2879payne.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/adopted/h.2879public safety.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/proposed/h.2879cobb.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/adopted/h.2879appropriations.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74174&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74174&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74174&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=74174&billStatusActionId=194634&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=74174&billStatusActionId=195248&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=74174&billStatusActionId=195648&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=74174&billStatusActionId=195779&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback