AZ HB2876 | 2024 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-11 - Senate read second time
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-11 - Senate read second time
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Elections; mailing; curing; canvassing; precincts
Title
Elections; mailing; curing; canvassing; precincts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-29 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - House - House Municipal Oversight & Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - House - House Municipal Oversight & Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-11 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Assigned to Senate ELEC Committee |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2024-02-29 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (31-28-0-0) |
2024-02-28 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2024-02-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2024-02-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2024-02-20 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-20 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-19 | House | House consent calendar |
2024-02-19 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0-0) |
2024-02-14 | House | House MOE Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-4-0-0-0-0) |
2024-02-12 | House | House read second time |
2024-02-08 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2024-02-08 | House | Assigned to House MOE Committee |
2024-02-08 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Canvassing
Conduct Of Elections
Conforming Legislation
Curing
Elections
Elections And Electors - Title 16
Free, Fair And Transparent Elections Act
Mailing
Precincts
Short Title
Conduct Of Elections
Conforming Legislation
Curing
Elections
Elections And Electors - Title 16
Free, Fair And Transparent Elections Act
Mailing
Precincts
Short Title
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 411 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
16 | 541 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
16 | 542 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
16 | 550 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
16 | 558.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
16 | 642 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
16 | 648 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |