AZ HB2866 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular
Note: Replaces legislation SB1733
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-28 - Chapter 317
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-28 - Chapter 317
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
K-12 education; 2022-2023
Title
K-12 education; 2022-2023
Sponsors
Rep. Regina Cobb [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-23 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-23 - Senate - Motion HB 2866 substituted for SB 1733. Motion carried. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-23 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-23 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-23 - Senate - Motion HB 2866 substituted for SB 1733. Motion carried. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-23 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-23 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-28 | Senate | Chapter 317 |
2022-06-28 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2022-06-23 | House | Transmit to House |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (21-7-2-0) |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Senate miscellaneous motion: HB 2866 substituted for SB 1733. Motion carried. |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2022-06-23 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (48-10-2-0) |
2022-06-23 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2022-06-21 | House | House read second time |
2022-06-21 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-06-21 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-06-21 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-3-0-0-0-0) |
2022-06-21 | House | House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-5-0-0-0-0) |
2022-06-20 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2022-06-20 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2022-06-20 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
SB1733 (Replaces) 2022-06-23 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Subjects
2022-2023
Appropriations
Education - Title 15
K-12 Education
Public Lands - Title 37
State Government - Title 41
Taxation - Title 42
Appropriations
Education - Title 15
K-12 Education
Public Lands - Title 37
State Government - Title 41
Taxation - Title 42
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 1371 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 1372 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 185 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 217 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 217.01 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 217.02 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 217.03 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 2405 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 249.17 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 249.18 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 393 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 901 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 910 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 913.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 943 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 945 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 952 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 953 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 961 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 971 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 994 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
37 | 521 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 1276 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 5731 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 17051 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |