AZ HB2835 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Transmit to House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Theme park districts; extension

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Theme park districts; extension

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-13 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-24 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-13HouseTransmit to House
2021-04-13SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (23-7-0-0)
2021-04-13SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2021-04-12SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2021-04-12SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2021-04-12SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2021-03-24SenateSenate FIN Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-4-1-0)
2021-03-03SenateSenate read second time
2021-03-02SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2021-03-02SenateAssigned to Senate FIN Committee
2021-03-02SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2021-02-24SenateTransmit to Senate
2021-02-24HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (57-2-1-0)
2021-02-24HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2021-02-22HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2021-02-22HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2021-02-22HouseHouse Committee of the Whole consent calendar
2021-02-22HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
2021-02-17HouseHouse APPROP Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (12-0-0-1-0-0)
2021-02-11HouseHouse read second time
2021-02-10HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2021-02-10HouseAssigned to House APPROP Committee
2021-02-10HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
486201Amended CodeSee Bill Text
486202Amended CodeSee Bill Text
486204Amended CodeSee Bill Text
486231Amended CodeSee Bill Text
486232Amended CodeSee Bill Text
486233Amended CodeSee Bill Text
486253Amended CodeSee Bill Text
486272Amended CodeSee Bill Text
486281Amended CodeSee Bill Text
486282Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/76035
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/hb2835p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/hb2835h.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/hb2835s.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/proposed/h.2835cobb.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/adopted/h.2835appropriations.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/proposed/s.2835livingston.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/adopted/s.2835fin.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/adopted/s.2835floorfann.docx.htm
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/484306
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/484814
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/485600
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/487634
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/487952
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/487821
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/488860
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/488918
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=76035&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=76035&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=76035&billStatusActionId=201515&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=76035&billStatusActionId=201534&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=76035&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=76035&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=76035&billStatusActionId=203671&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=76035&billStatusActionId=203688&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback