AZ HB2799 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 19-10)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-24 - House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (11-0-0-0-0-0)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Appropriation; area agencies on aging.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriation; area agencies on aging.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-19 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-24HouseHouse APPROP Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (11-0-0-0-0-0)
2020-02-12HouseHouse read second time
2020-02-11HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2020-02-11HouseAssigned to House APPROP Committee
2020-02-11HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Arizona State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback