AZ HB2797 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-26 - House minority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-26 - House minority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Aggravated assault; security guard; definition
Title
Aggravated assault; security guard; definition
Sponsors
Rep. Kevin Payne [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-26 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-26 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-26 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-26 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2020-02-21 | House | House JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-4-0-0-0-0) |
2020-02-11 | House | House read second time |
2020-02-10 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2020-02-10 | House | Assigned to House JUD Committee |
2020-02-10 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |