AZ HB2792 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 23-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-28 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on May 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-28 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Early ballots; request required
Title
Early ballots; request required
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-27 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House Government & Elections Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House Government & Elections Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-28 | Governor Vetoed | |
2021-05-27 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2021-05-27 | House | Transmit to House |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (16-14-0-0) |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-3-0-0) |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Senate GOV Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2021-03-04 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (31-28-1-0) |
2021-02-25 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2021-02-23 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-23 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-23 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-17 | House | House GE Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-5-0-1-0-0) |
2021-02-08 | House | House read second time |
2021-02-04 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-02-04 | House | Assigned to House GE Committee |
2021-02-04 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Class 5 Felony
County Recorder
Early Ballots
Early Voting
Election Officers
Elections And Electors - Title 16
Permanent Early Voting Lists
Request
Required
County Recorder
Early Ballots
Early Voting
Election Officers
Elections And Electors - Title 16
Permanent Early Voting Lists
Request
Required