AZ HB2791 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-2-1-0)
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-2-1-0)
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriations; State Route 88; repair
Title
Appropriations; State Route 88; repair
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 18 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House Transportation Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 18 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House Transportation Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-2-1-0) |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2020-03-02 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (38-18-4-0) |
2020-03-02 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2020-02-26 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-26 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-26 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2020-02-24 | House | House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-3-0-0-0-0) |
2020-02-19 | House | House TRANS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-1-0-0) |
2020-02-10 | House | House read second time |
2020-02-06 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2020-02-06 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2020-02-06 | House | Assigned to House TRANS Committee |
2020-02-06 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |