AZ HB2790 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Senate ED Committee action: Failed To Pass, voting: (3-6-0-0)
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Senate ED Committee action: Failed To Pass, voting: (3-6-0-0)
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Baccalaureate degrees; community colleges
Title
Baccalaureate degrees; community colleges
Sponsors
Rep. Becky Nutt [R] | Rep. Russell Bowers [R] | Rep. Regina Cobb [R] | Sen. Warren Petersen [R] |
Sen. Thomas Shope [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (FAILED) (Y: 3 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-27 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senate ED Committee action: Failed To Pass, voting: (3-6-0-0) |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Assigned to Senate ED Committee |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2020-02-27 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (42-18-0-0) |
2020-02-27 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2020-02-25 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-25 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-25 | House | House consent calendar |
2020-02-25 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0) |
2020-02-17 | House | House ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-3-1-2-0-0) |
2020-02-12 | House | House read second time |
2020-02-11 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2020-02-11 | House | Assigned to House ED Committee |
2020-02-11 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 1401 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 1444 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |