AZ HB2774 | 2012 | Fiftieth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 23-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-12 - House minority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-12 - House minority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Property tax exemption; religious property
Title
Property tax exemption; religious property
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-10 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-05 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 5 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-08 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-05 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 5 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-08 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-12 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-04-12 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-04-10 | Transmit to House | |
2012-04-05 | Senate third reading FAILED voting: (5-24-1-0) | |
2012-03-15 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2012-03-13 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-03-13 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-03-12 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2012-03-05 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-03-08 | Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-0-2-0) | |
2012-03-06 | Referred to Senate FIN Committee | |
2012-03-06 | Senate read second time | |
2012-03-05 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-03-05 | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee | |
2012-03-05 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | |
2012-03-01 | Transmit to Senate | |
2012-03-01 | House third reading PASSED voting: (43-13-3-0) | |
2012-02-29 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2012-02-21 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-02-21 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-02-20 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-0-0) | |
2012-02-07 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2012-02-13 | House WM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-3-0-0-0) | |
2012-02-08 | Referred to House WM Committee | |
2012-02-08 | House read second time | |
2012-02-07 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2012-02-07 | Assigned to House WM Committee | |
2012-02-07 | Introduced in House and read first time |