AZ HB2753 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-10 - Chapter 441
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-10 - Chapter 441
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Liquor licensees; records; food safety
Title
Liquor licensees; records; food safety
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-30 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-10 | Senate | Chapter 441 |
2021-07-10 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-06-30 | House | House final reading PASSED, voting: (48-10-2-0) |
2021-06-30 | House | House concurs |
2021-04-22 | House | House minority caucus |
2021-04-22 | House | House Conference Committee recommended |
2021-04-20 | House | Transmit to House |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (20-8-2-0) |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (10-0-0-0) |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2021-03-18 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (55-5-0-0) |
2021-03-18 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2021-02-24 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2021-02-22 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-22 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-22 | House | House Committee of the Whole consent calendar |
2021-02-22 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-16 | House | House COM Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (9-0-0-1-0-0) |
2021-02-03 | House | House read second time |
2021-02-02 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-02-02 | House | Assigned to House COM Committee |
2021-02-02 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - Title 4
Distilleries
Environmental Exemption
Federal Law (h)
Food Safety
Licensing
Liquor
Liquor Licensees (h)
Preemption (h)
Proprietary Information (h)
Records
Distilleries
Environmental Exemption
Federal Law (h)
Food Safety
Licensing
Liquor
Liquor Licensees (h)
Preemption (h)
Proprietary Information (h)
Records
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
36 | 136 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
4 | 119 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
4 | 225 | New Code | See Bill Text |