AZ HB2749 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular

Note: Replaces legislation SB1551

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Chapter 265
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

K-12 education; budget reconciliation; 2019-2020.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

K-12 education; budget reconciliation; 2019-2020.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-27 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-27 - Senate - Motion HB 2749 substituted for SB 1551. Motion carried. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-25 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-25 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-31SenateChapter 265
2019-05-31SenateGovernor Signed
2019-05-27SenateTransmitted to Governor
2019-05-27HouseTransmit to House
2019-05-27SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (17-12-1-0)
2019-05-27SenateSenate miscellaneous motion: HB 2749 substituted for SB 1551. Motion carried.
2019-05-27SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2019-05-25SenateTransmit to Senate
2019-05-25HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (31-28-1-0)
2019-05-25HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2019-05-23HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2019-05-23HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2019-05-23HouseHouse read second time
2019-05-23HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (4-3-0-1-0-0)
2019-05-22HouseHouse APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-5-0-0-0-0)
2019-05-21HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2019-05-21HouseAssigned to House APPROP Committee
2019-05-21HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Same As/Similar To

SB1551 (Replaces) 2019-05-27 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
151323Amended CodeSee Bill Text
15154Amended CodeSee Bill Text
15155Amended CodeSee Bill Text
15185Amended CodeSee Bill Text
152011Amended CodeSee Bill Text
152022Amended CodeSee Bill Text
152041Amended CodeSee Bill Text
152405New CodeSee Bill Text
15249.06Amended CodeSee Bill Text
15249.08Amended CodeSee Bill Text
15249.15New CodeSee Bill Text
15901Amended CodeSee Bill Text
15901.07Amended CodeSee Bill Text
15913Amended CodeSee Bill Text
15945Amended CodeSee Bill Text
15972Amended CodeSee Bill Text
15994Amended CodeSee Bill Text
411276Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/72419
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/hb2749p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/hb2749h.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/laws/0265.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72419&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72419&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72419&billStatusActionId=189807&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72419&billStatusActionId=189815&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72419&billStatusActionId=189892&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72419&billStatusActionId=189919&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback