AZ HB2747 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular

Note: Replaces legislation SB1548

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Chapter 263
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

General appropriations act; 2019-2020.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

General appropriations act; 2019-2020.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-27 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-27 - Senate - Motion HB 2747 substituted for SB 1548. Motion carried. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-25 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-25 - House - House - Motion by Representative Pawlick to amend COW report to include Pawlick #2 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-25 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-31SenateChapter 263
2019-05-31SenateGovernor Signed
2019-05-27SenateTransmitted to Governor
2019-05-27HouseTransmit to House
2019-05-27SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (16-13-1-0)
2019-05-27SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2019-05-27SenateSenate miscellaneous motion: HB 2747 substituted for SB 1548. Motion carried.
2019-05-25SenateTransmit to Senate
2019-05-25HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (31-28-1-0)
2019-05-25HouseHouse motion to amend
2019-05-25HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2019-05-23HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2019-05-23HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2019-05-23HouseHouse read second time
2019-05-23HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (4-3-0-1-0-0)
2019-05-22HouseHouse APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-4-0-0-0-0)
2019-05-21HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2019-05-21HouseAssigned to House APPROP Committee
2019-05-21HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Same As/Similar To

SB1548 (Replaces) 2019-05-27 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended

Subjects


Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/72417
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/hb2747p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/hb2747h.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/laws/0263.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/proposed/h.2747espinoza.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/proposed/h.2747fernandez.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/proposed/h.2747friese.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/proposed/h.2747lieberman.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72417&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72417&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72417&billStatusActionId=189810&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72417&billStatusActionId=189811&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72417&billStatusActionId=189812&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72417&billStatusActionId=189893&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72417&billStatusActionId=189911&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback