AZ HB2735 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - Senate read second time
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - Senate read second time
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Guilty except insane; court jurisdiction
Title
Guilty except insane; court jurisdiction
Sponsors
Sen. Nancy Barto [R] | Rep. John Allen [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-26 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2020-02-26 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (34-25-1-0) |
2020-02-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2020-02-25 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-25 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-25 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0) |
2020-02-12 | House | House JUD Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-4-0-0-0-0) |
2020-02-04 | House | House read second time |
2020-02-03 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2020-02-03 | House | Assigned to House JUD Committee |
2020-02-03 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Counties - Title 11
Court Jurisdiction
Courts And Civil Proceedings - Title 12
Criminal Code - Title 13
Guilty Except Insane
Psychiatric Security Review Board
Public Defenders
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
State Government - Title 41
Court Jurisdiction
Courts And Civil Proceedings - Title 12
Criminal Code - Title 13
Guilty Except Insane
Psychiatric Security Review Board
Public Defenders
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
State Government - Title 41
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 584 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
12 | 253 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
12 | 820.02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
13 | 2503 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
13 | 3991 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
13 | 3992 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
13 | 3993 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
13 | 3994 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
13 | 3995 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
13 | 3996 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
13 | 3997 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
13 | 3998 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
13 | 3999 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
13 | 4000 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
13 | 4416 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
13 | 502 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 206 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 209 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 545.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 3020.11 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 3803 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |