AZ HB2717 | 2023 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-5)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Chapter 109
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-5)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Chapter 109
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Trauma counseling; 911 dispatchers
Title
Trauma counseling; 911 dispatchers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-26 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-06 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-07 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - House - House Transportation & Infrastructure Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - House - House Military Affairs & Public Safety Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-06 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-07 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - House - House Transportation & Infrastructure Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - House - House Military Affairs & Public Safety Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-01 | Senate | Chapter 109 |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2023-04-26 | House | House final reading PASSED, voting: (58-0-1-0) |
2023-04-26 | House | House concurs |
2023-04-26 | House | House minority caucus: Conference |
2023-04-26 | House | House Conference Committee recommended |
2023-04-11 | House | Transmit to House |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (28-0-2-0) |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Senate COM Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-0-1-0) |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Assigned to Senate COM Committee |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2023-03-07 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (60-0-0-0) |
2023-02-28 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2023-02-27 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2023-02-27 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2023-02-27 | House | House Committee of the Whole consent calendar |
2023-02-27 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2023-02-15 | House | House TI Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (10-0-0-1-0-0) |
2023-02-13 | House | House MAPS Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0) |
2023-02-08 | House | House read second time |
2023-02-07 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2023-02-07 | House | Assigned to House TI Committee |
2023-02-07 | House | Assigned to House MAPS Committee |
2023-02-07 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
911 Dispatchers
Communicable Disease Information
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
Trauma Counseling (s)
Traumatic Event Counseling (s)
Communicable Disease Information
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
Trauma Counseling (s)
Traumatic Event Counseling (s)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
38 | 672 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
38 | 673 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |