AZ HB2688 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-22 - Senate minority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-22 - Senate minority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Mobile homes; taxes; abandonment; sales
Title
Mobile homes; taxes; abandonment; sales
Sponsors
Rep. Bob Thorpe [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Public Safety Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Technology Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Public Safety Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Technology Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-22 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Senate TPS Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (7-1-0-0) |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Assigned to Senate TPS Committee |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2019-03-19 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (32-27-1-0) |
2019-03-19 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2019-03-07 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-03-07 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-03-06 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0) |
2019-02-20 | House | House TECH Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-0-0-0-0) |
2019-02-14 | House | House read second time |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to House TECH Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
33 | 1476.04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
33 | 1478 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 19107 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 19117 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 19151 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 19158 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 19160 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |