AZ HB2680 | 2010 | Forty-ninth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-0-0-3-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-0-0-3-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Contractor retention
Title
Contractor retention
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-0-0-3-0) | |
2010-02-08 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2010-02-17 | House COM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-1-0-1-0) | |
2010-02-09 | Referred to House COM Committee | |
2010-02-09 | House read second time | |
2010-02-08 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2010-02-08 | Assigned to House COM Committee | |
2010-02-08 | Introduced in House and read first time |
Arizona State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.azleg.gov/DocumentsForBill.asp?Session_ID=93&Bill_Number=HB2680 |
Text | http://www.azleg.gov/legtext/49leg/2r/bills/hb2680p.htm |