AZ HB2679 | 2024 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-14 - House RA Committee action: Failed To Pass, voting: (1-5-0-0-0-0)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-14 - House RA Committee action: Failed To Pass, voting: (1-5-0-0-0-0)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Regulation; hemp-derived products.
Title
Regulation; hemp-derived products.
Sponsors
Rep. Kevin Payne [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-14 - House - House Regulatory Affairs Committee Action (FAILED) (Y: 1 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-02-05 - House - House Land, Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - House - House Land, Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-14 | House | House RA Committee action: Failed To Pass, voting: (1-5-0-0-0-0) |
2024-02-05 | House | House LARA Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0) |
2024-01-30 | House | House read second time |
2024-01-29 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2024-01-29 | House | Assigned to House RA Committee |
2024-01-29 | House | Assigned to House LARA Committee |
2024-01-29 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Agriculture - Title 3
Exemption From Rulemaking
Hemp-derived Products
Industrial Hemp
Legislative Findings
Regulation
Exemption From Rulemaking
Hemp-derived Products
Industrial Hemp
Legislative Findings
Regulation
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
3 | 311 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
3 | 312 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
3 | 313. | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
3 | 316 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
3 | 317 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
3 | 318 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
3 | 320 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |