AZ HB2676 | 2010 | Forty-ninth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on April 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-23 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on April 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-23 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Energy park authority
Title
Energy park authority
Sponsors
Rep. Kirk Adams [R] | Rep. Cloves Campbell [D] | Sen. John McComish [R] | Rep. Robert Meza [D] |
Rep. Warde Nichols [R] | Sen. Lynne Pancrazi [D] | Rep. Andy Tobin [R] | Sen. Steven Yarbrough [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-23 | Governor Signed | |
2010-04-19 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2010-04-19 | House final reading , voting: (42-13-5-0) | |
2010-04-19 | House Concurrence , voting: (0-0-0-0) | |
2010-04-15 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-15 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-14 | Transmit to House | |
2010-04-14 | Senate third reading , voting: (22-8-0-0) | |
2010-04-13 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2010-04-08 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-08 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-05 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration Amended | |
2010-03-25 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-03-30 | Senate CED Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (7-1-0-0) | |
2010-03-25 | Referred to Senate CED Committee | |
2010-03-25 | Senate read second time | |
2010-03-25 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-03-25 | Assigned to Senate CED Committee | |
2010-03-23 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | |
2010-03-22 | Transmit to Senate | |
2010-03-22 | House third reading , voting: (32-26-2-0) | |
2010-03-04 | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar | |
2010-03-01 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-03-01 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-03-01 | House RULES Committee action: amended constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-2-0-1-0) | |
2010-02-09 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2010-02-23 | House GOV Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-1-0-2-0) | |
2010-02-10 | Referred to House GOV Committee | |
2010-02-10 | House read second time | |
2010-02-09 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2010-02-09 | Assigned to House GOV Committee | |
2010-02-09 | Introduced in House and read first time |